Global Patent Index - EP 2022577 A1

EP 2022577 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SALT CORE FOR CASTING AND SALT CORE FOR CASTING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING SALT CORE FOR CASTING AND SALT CORE FOR CASTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SALZKERNS ZUM GIESSEN UND SALZKERN ZUM GIESSEN

Title (fr)

NOYAU DE SEL POUR COULAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 2022577 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07743674 A

Priority

  • JP 2007060239 W
  • JP 2006138879 A

Abstract (en)

When forming an expendable salt core (2) by die casting, first, a salt mixture containing at least a potassium salt and a sodium salt is melted by heating to obtain a melt. Subsequently, the temperature of the melt is decreased to set the melt in a semi-solidified (solid-liquid coexisting) state. The melt in the semi-solidified state is injected into a metal mold for an expendable salt core under a high pressure and solidified. After solidification, the obtained expendable salt core is taken out of the metal mold.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/10 (2006.01); B22C 1/00 (2006.01); B22C 9/24 (2006.01); B22D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/105 (2013.01); B22D 29/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022577 A1 20090211; EP 2022577 A4 20130320; JP 4685933 B2 20110518; JP WO2007135995 A1 20091001; US 2009205801 A1 20090820; WO 2007135995 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-01-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20151209

2016-01-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAOKAWA, JUN

2016-01-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANZAI, KOICHI

2016-01-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YAMADA, YOUJI

2013-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUEHLER AG

2013-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUEHLER AG

2013-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2013-03-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130214

2013-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22C 9/10 20060101AFI20130208BHEP

2013-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22D 29/00 20060101ALI20130208BHEP

2013-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22C 9/24 20060101ALI20130208BHEP

2013-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B22C 1/00 20060101ALI20130208BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS