Global Patent Index - EP 2022604 A2

EP 2022604 A2 2009-02-11 - Suction head for a vacuum holding device

Title (en)

Suction head for a vacuum holding device

Title (de)

Saugkopf für eine Vakuumhaltevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Tête aspirante pour un dispositif de maintien du vide

Publication

EP 2022604 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08012888 A

Priority

DE 102007037335 A

Abstract (en)

The head (13) has a carrier with a carrier plate and a fastening section for fastening the head at a suction head holder (12) of a vacuum holding device (10). The plate has an inlet side and a holding side at opposite sides. An elastic suction cup is arranged at the inlet side and distant from the holding side of the fastening section. The suction cup comprises a planar suction surface (16) for suction of workpiece, where the carrier is made of fiber-reinforced plastic and contains a reinforcement rib structure.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Saugkopf (13) für eine Vakuumhaltevorrichtung (10) zum Halten eines Werkstücks mittels Vakuum. Bei dem Saugkopf (13) ist vorgesehen, dass er einen Träger (50) mit einer Trägerplatte (52) und mit einem Befestigungsabschnitt (51) zum Befestigen des Saugkopfs (13) an einem Saugkopf-Halter (12) einer Saugkopf-Vorrichtung der Vakuumhaltevorrichtung (10) aufweist, dass die Trägerplatte (52) an einander entgegengesetzten Seiten eine Ansaugseite (54) und eine Halteseite aufweist, wobei an der Ansaugseite (54) ein elastischer Saugteller (53) angeordnet ist und von der Halteseite der Befestigungsabschnitt (51) absteht, und dass der Saugteller (53) eine Ansaugfläche (16) zum Ansaugen eines Werkstücks aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/007 (2013.01); B25B 11/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022604 A2 20090211; EP 2022604 A3 20091021; DE 102007037335 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2010-10-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100422

2010-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2010-06-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20100421

- Countries: AL

2010-06-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20100421

- Countries: BA

2010-06-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20100421

- Countries: MK

2010-06-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20100421

- Countries: RS

2010-06-16 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2010-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100421

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS