Global Patent Index - EP 2022605 A2

EP 2022605 A2 2009-02-11 - Workpiece holder with touch valve for a vacuum holding device

Title (en)

Workpiece holder with touch valve for a vacuum holding device

Title (de)

Werkstück-Halter mit Tastventil für eine Vakuumhaltevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Support de pièce à usiner doté d'un bouton d'aération pour un dispositif de maintien du vide

Publication

EP 2022605 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08012893 A

Priority

DE 102007037338 A

Abstract (en)

The holder (11) has a suction head (13), and a touch valve with an actuator protruding from an intake area (16) of the suction head, where the intake area is provided to intake a workpiece. The actuator actuates the touch valve, which produces a vacuum at the intake area, opens a fluid connection to a vacuum connection of the holder. The suction head is an integral part of a suction head holder (12) for holding the suction head, where the suction head is detachably fastened to the head holder and is removable from the head holder, and the suction head has an opening for the actuator.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Werkstück-Halter (11) für eine Vakuumhaltevorrichtung (10) zum Halten eines Werkstücks mittels Vakuum, mit einem Saugkopf (13), und mit einem Tastventil (63), das ein vor eine zum Ansaugen eines Werkstücks vorgesehene Ansaugfläche (16) des Saugkopfs (13) vorstehendes Betätigungsglied (64) aufweist, bei dessen Betätigung das Tastventil (63) zur Erzeugung eines Vakuums an der Ansaugfläche (16) des Saugkopfs (13) eine Fluidverbindung (65) zu einem Vakuumanschluss (66) des Werkstück-Halters (11) öffnet. Bei dem Werkstück-Halter (11) ist vorgesehen, dass das Tastventil (63) ein Bestandteil eines Saugkopf-Halters (12) zum Halten des Saugkopfs (13) ist, und dass der Saugkopf (13) ein an dem Saugkopf-Halter (12) lösbar befestigtes, von diesem entfernbares Bauteil ist, und dass der Saugkopf (13) eine Durchtrittsöffnung (76) für das Betätigungsglied (64) aufweist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 11/007 (2013.01); B25B 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022605 A2 20090211; EP 2022605 A3 20091014; EP 2022605 B1 20111123; DE 102007037338 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-05-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-12-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREGENZER UND REULE PARTNERSCHA, DE

2014-10-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FESTOOL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FESTOOL GROUP GMBH & CO. KG, 73240 WENDLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Effective date: 20140918

2014-10-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: BREGENZER, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140918

2014-10-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREGENZER UND REULE PARTNERSCHA, DE

- Effective date: 20140918

2014-09-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: BREGENZER, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FESTOOL GROUP GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FESTOOL GMBH, 73240 WENDLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-01-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FESTOOL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FESTOOL GMBH, 73240 WENDLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE MAGENBAUER & KOLLEGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: BREGENZER, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20121119

2013-01-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREGENZER UND REULE PARTNERSCHA, DE

- Effective date: 20121119

2012-12-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Effective date: 20120824

2012-11-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE MAGENBAUER & KOLLEGEN, DE

2012-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120824

2012-01-19 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008005634

- Effective date: 20120119

2011-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-04-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100310

2009-10-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS