Global Patent Index - EP 2022629 A2

EP 2022629 A2 2009-02-11 - Swivelling printing units

Title (en)

Swivelling printing units

Title (de)

Schwenkbare Druckwerke

Title (fr)

Unités d' impression pivotantes

Publication

EP 2022629 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08161362 A

Priority

DE 102007037185 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a printing device with printing units (2, 3), which are provided with a transfer cylinder (4) and a plate cylinder (5). The plate cylinder of the printing units together forms a printing gap of the printing device. The printing units are clamped in a frame (7), where the printing units are lockable in a printing contact position and a deviated position. The frame is connected with the machine in the rotational axis in detachable manner.

Abstract (de)

Druckmaschine mit wenigstens einem Druckwerk, das Druckwerk (1) mit f) einer ersten Druckeinheit (2, 3) mit einem Übertragungszylinder (4) und einem Formzylinder (5), g) einer zweiten Druckeinheit (2, 3) mit einem Übertragungszylinder (4) und einem Formzylinder (5), wobei h) die Übertragungszylinder (5) der ersten und der zweiten Druckeinheit (2, 3) miteinander einen Druckspalt (8) des Druckwerkes (1) bilden, und i) die erste und die zweite Druckeinheit (2, 3) je in einem Rahmen (7) gehalten sind, dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass j) jeder der Rahmen (7) nur in jeweils einer Achse (6) mit der Druckmaschine verbunden ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 7/12 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/24 (2013.01); B41F 7/12 (2013.01); B41F 13/0024 (2013.01); B41P 2217/11 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022629 A2 20090211; EP 2022629 A3 20091021; DE 102007037185 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100618

2010-06-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100421

2009-10-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-10-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/00 20060101AFI20081110BHEP

2009-10-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 13/24 20060101ALI20090915BHEP

2009-10-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41F 7/12 20060101ALI20090915BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS