Global Patent Index - EP 2022697 A1

EP 2022697 A1 2009-02-11 - Communication system for vehicles particularly railway vehicles or the like and stationary units

Title (en)

Communication system for vehicles particularly railway vehicles or the like and stationary units

Title (de)

System zur Kommunikation zwischen Fahrzeugen, insbesondere Schienenfahrzeugen, und Streckeneinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Système de communication entre véhicules, particulièrement ferroviaires, et des postes fixes

Publication

EP 2022697 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07425516 A

Priority

EP 07425516 A

Abstract (en)

Communication system for vehicles, particularly railway vehicles or the like and stationary units, which system provides: equipment on each railway vehicle which so called on-board equipment is associated to a section transmitting signals interrogating at least one or more operating stationary units each one provided at one of various predetermined locations of the vehicle route and particularly of the railway line and which equipment is associated to a section receiving reply signals of at least one or more operating stationary units that have been interrogated, while operating stationary units are provided with receiving/transmitting means for receiving interrogation signals and for transmitting reply signals. According to the invention, the transmission section of the equipment on a vehicle produces an interrogation signal composed of a carrier wave that is frequency-modulated according to a modulation key corresponding to a univocal identification code of the railway vehicle or the like that is different and unique for each vehicle, while receiving/transmitting means of operating stationary units receive said interrogation signal and re-transmit it to the receiving section associated to the on-board equipment adding the signal contribution containing reply information of the corresponding operating stationary unit in the form of a carrier modulation by said reply information to the signal received and frequency-modulated with the vehicle identification code.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 3/121 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9411754 A1 19940526 - SIEMENS AG ALBIS [CH], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022697 A1 20090211; EP 2022697 B1 20100203

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101104

2010-02-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2009-11-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): IT

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080818

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS