Global Patent Index - EP 2022722 A1

EP 2022722 A1 2009-02-11 - Labelling machine

Title (en)

Labelling machine

Title (de)

Etikettierungsgerät

Title (fr)

Machine d'étiquetage

Publication

EP 2022722 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08013726 A

Priority

IT MI20071664 A

Abstract (en)

A machine for printing and applying labels on containers, comprising: - a reel (1) of adhesive tape (5) from which the labels are formed; - an unwinding system of the reel (1) comprising at least an unwinding roll (8) and a tensioning device (9) of tape (5); - optionally a photocell (4) between the unwinding system of the reel (1) and the printing group; - a tape (5) adhesivized on the internal side of reel (1); - a printing group (3) comprising a printing system formed of a printing head (3b) and a rotating driving roll (3a) for the tape (5) that cyclically inverts its rotation direction; - cutting system (2) comprising: - a cutting blade (2a); - a counterblade (2b); - an applying pad (6); wherein: - between the roll (3a) and the counterblade (2b) a lamina (16) is inserted perpendicularly to the longitudinal axis of roll (3a), one end of said lamina being one end positioned near the upper edge of the counterblade (2b) and the opposite end near the roll (3a).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/1826 (2013.01); B65C 2009/1861 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1447333 A1 20040818 - IRPLAST SPA [IT]

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022722 A1 20090211; EP 2022722 B1 20130109; IT MI20071664 A1 20090210

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140731

2015-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-12-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 6

2013-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): GB IT

2013-01-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-07-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110606

2009-11-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): GB IT

2009-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS