Global Patent Index - EP 2022724 A1

EP 2022724 A1 2009-02-11 - Flexible plastic tubes and method of manufacturing same

Title (en)

Flexible plastic tubes and method of manufacturing same

Title (de)

Flexible Plastikrohre und ihr Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Tubes souples en matière plastique et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2022724 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08017038 A

Priority

  • EP 05786072 A
  • FR 0407471 A

Abstract (en)

The tube (210) is made from an extruded cylindrical sleeve (220) of plastic or metal and plastic, preferably between 0.25 and 0.35 mm thick and having a diameter of over 34 mm. The sleeve is fitted with a dispensing head (230), also of plastic, made with a rim shaped for clipping on a cover or a cap (240) with a hinge (243), and a shoulder of less than 1 mm thick.

Abstract (fr)

Tube souple (210) ayant une tête de distribution (230) et une jupe cylindrique (220) en matière plastique ou métalloplastique, de diamètre supérieur à 40 mm, caractérisé en ce que ladite jupe cylindrique a une épaisseur inférieure à 0,40 mm, en ce qu'elle comprend au moins 70% en poids, de polyéthylène haute densité (PE.HD), de masse spécifique comprise entre 0,935 g/cm3 et 0,97 g/cm3, et en ce qu'elle comprend au plus 30% en poids, de polyéthylène basse densité (PE.BD), de masse spécifique comprise entre 0,86 g/cm3 et 0,93 g/cm3, et dont plus de 50% est un PE.BD linéaire. Capsule-service (240) exempte de nervures radiales, possédant une jupe de fixation (246) plus épaisse que le reste de la paroi de la capsule-service et une coiffe ayant, au regard de la partie supérieure de la prise de doigt, une paroi inclinée vers l'intérieur de la base de la capsule, avec un angle d'inclinaison inférieur à 35°. L'ensemble tube et capsule-service fournit un conditionnement particulièrement léger parfaitement machinable en grandes cadences.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/10 (2006.01); B65D 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/10 (2013.01); B65D 47/0804 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR PL

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

FR 2872792 A1 20060113; FR 2872792 B1 20060811; BR PI0513140 A 20080429; CN 101001789 A 20070718; CN 101001789 B 20101208; DE 602005011293 D1 20090108; DE 602005025548 D1 20110203; EP 1765685 A1 20070328; EP 1765685 B1 20081126; EP 2022724 A1 20090211; EP 2022724 B1 20101222; MX 2007000233 A 20070321; RU 2007104344 A 20080820; US 2007210103 A1 20070913; US 8365955 B2 20130205; WO 2006013276 A1 20060209

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2016-07-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2015-07-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2014-12-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TUBEX GMBH

- Effective date: 20110921

2013-07-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TUPACK VERPACKUNGEN GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110922

2013-04-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TUBEX GMBH

- Effective date: 20110921

2013-04-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TUPACK VERPACKUNGEN GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110922

2013-04-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: LINHARDT GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20110921

2013-04-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ESSEL DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG(DE)/ ESSEL PROPACK

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-12-22 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 602005025548

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINHARDT GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TUBEX GMBH

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ESSEL DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG(DE)/ E

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-11-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TUPACK VERPACKUNGEN GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110922

2011-05-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-02-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602005025548

- Effective date: 20110203

2011-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602005025548 P 20110203

2010-12-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1765685 P

2010-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR PL

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR PL

2009-04-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090330

2009-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090220

2009-02-11 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1765685 P

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR PL

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU