Global Patent Index - EP 2022743 A1

EP 2022743 A1 2009-02-11 - ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 2022743 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06780622 A

Priority

JP 2006310988 W

Abstract (en)

A counterweight is provided with a displacement body that is displaceable with respect to the counterweight. A car and the counterweight are suspended by a main rope connected to the displacement body. The counterweight is provided with a weight-side fixed pulley, and the displacement body is provided with a weight-side movable pulley. When the displacement body is pulled by the main rope to be displaced with respect to the counterweight, the weight-side movable pulley is thereby displaced away from the weight-side fixed pulley. A hoistway-side upper return pulley and a hoistway-side lower return pulley are provided in an upper portion of a hoistway and a lower portion of the hoistway, respectively. A drive rope, to which a tensile force is applied through displacement of the weight-side movable pulley away from the weight-side fixed pulley, is looped in succession around the hoistway-side upper return pulley, the weight-side fixed pulley, the weight-side movable pulley, and the hoistway-side lower return pulley. When the drive device rotates the hoistway-side upper return pulley, the car and the counterweight are thereby raised/lowered within the hoistway.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/003 (2013.01); B66B 11/009 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022743 A1 20090211; EP 2022743 A4 20130410; CN 101356110 A 20090128; CN 101356110 B 20100714; JP WO2007138706 A1 20091001; KR 100975689 B1 20100812; KR 20080072715 A 20080806; WO 2007138706 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-04-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 11/08 20060101ALI20130301BHEP

2013-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 11/00 20060101AFI20130301BHEP

2013-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 7/06 20060101ALI20130301BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080610

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU