Global Patent Index - EP 2022744 A1

EP 2022744 A1 2009-02-11 - ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (en)

ELEVATOR DEVICE

Title (de)

AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 2022744 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06756872 A

Priority

JP 2006310991 W

Abstract (en)

In an upper portion of a hoistway, there is arranged a drive unit having a drive sheave which is driven to rotate around a rotation shaft disposed along a vertical direction. First and second main ropes serve to hang a common car, and hang a common counterweight. In the upper portion of the hoistway, there are arranged a first car side deflection wheel that guides the first main ropes to the car, a second car side deflection wheel that guides the second main ropes to the car, a first weight side deflection wheel that guides the first main ropes to the counterweight, and a second weight side deflection wheel that guides the second main ropes to the counterweight. Also, a horizontal defection wheel for deflecting the direction of the first main ropes is arranged at the upper portion of the hoistway. Portions of the first main ropes between the drive sheave and the first weight side deflection wheel are wrapped around the horizontal defection wheel. The first and second main ropes are respectively wrapped around the drive sheave in such a manner that at least a part of a force received by the rotation shaft of the drive sheave from the first main ropes and at least a part of a force received by the rotation shaft of the drive sheave from the second main ropes are counteracted with each other.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/08 (2006.01); B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/008 (2013.01); B66B 11/0045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022744 A1 20090211; EP 2022744 A4 20130130; CN 101356112 A 20090128; JP 5031558 B2 20120919; JP WO2007138707 A1 20091001; KR 101011280 B1 20110128; KR 20080095841 A 20081029; WO 2007138707 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-26 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140213

2013-01-30 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130107

2013-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 11/00 20060101ALI20121221BHEP

2013-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 7/06 20060101ALI20121221BHEP

2013-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 11/08 20060101AFI20121221BHEP

2013-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66B 7/00 20060101ALI20121221BHEP

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080605

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU