Global Patent Index - EP 2022770 A1

EP 2022770 A1 2009-02-11 - EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION, EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION MOLDED BODY, AND THEIR PRODUCTION METHODS

Title (en)

EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION, EXPLOSIVE COMPOSITION MOLDED BODY, AND THEIR PRODUCTION METHODS

Title (de)

SPRENGSTOFF, SPRENGSTOFF-FORMKÖRPER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PRÉPARATION EXPLOSIVE, ARTICLE MOULÉ DANS UNE PRÉPARATION EXPLOSIVE, ET LEURS MÉTHODES DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 2022770 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07741775 A

Priority

  • JP 2007058339 W
  • JP 2006115153 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides an explosive composition obtained by milling a fuel component and an oxidizer component with an aqueous emulsion of a hydrophobic tackifier and drying them, which is high in the water resistance and good in the extrusion moldability and cleanability of a shaping machine and less in the production problem. Also, the explosive composition according to the invention is preferable to be applied as a shaped body to a gas generating agent, an autoignition agent, an enhancer agent or the like. Further, the explosive composition shaped body according to the invention is particularly preferable to be used for a gas generator actuating an automobile safety device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06B 23/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/26 (2006.01); B60R 21/34 (2006.01); B60R 22/46 (2006.01); C06B 21/00 (2006.01); C06B 29/00 (2006.01); C06B 31/00 (2006.01); C06B 33/00 (2006.01); C06B 43/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/00 (2006.01); C06C 7/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06C 9/00 (2013.01); C06B 23/001 (2013.01); C06D 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007123120A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CZ

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022770 A1 20090211; CN 101466653 A 20090624; JP WO2007123120 A1 20090903; US 2009159163 A1 20090625; WO 2007123120 A1 20071101

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-15 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130408

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CZ

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081030

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS