Global Patent Index - EP 2022837 A1

EP 2022837 A1 2009-02-11 - Process and apparatus for recovering power from fcc product

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for recovering power from fcc product

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung von Energie aus einem FCC-Produkt

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de récupération d'alimentation à partir d'un produit fcc

Publication

EP 2022837 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08252572 A

Priority

  • US 83213607 A
  • US 83214307 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a process and apparatus for recovering power from an FCC product. The dry gas is combusted and combined with FCC regenerator flue gas to raise the power recovery capability of the flue gas. The flue gas can be used to generate electrical power or steam. Alternatively or additionally, dry gas from an FCC product stream is separated and delivered to an expander to recover power before combustion.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022837 A1 20090211; BR PI0803698 A2 20091201; CO 6110133 A1 20091231; MX 2008009843 A 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-11-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-10-07 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS