Global Patent Index - EP 2022838 A1

EP 2022838 A1 2009-02-11 - Process and apparatus for heating regeneration gas in Fluid Catalytic Cracking

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for heating regeneration gas in Fluid Catalytic Cracking

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu Erwärmen von Regenerationsgas im Wirbelschichtverfahren des katalytischen Cracking

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de chauffage du gaz de régénération dans le procédé de craquage catalytique en lit fluidisé

Publication

EP 2022838 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08252577 A

Priority

  • US 83214707 A
  • US 83215207 A

Abstract (en)

Disclosed is a process and apparatus for combusting dry gas to heat the air supplied to an FCC regenerator to increase its temperature and minimize production of undesirable combustion products. Preferably, the dry gas is a selected FCC product gas. Alternatively or additionally, dry gas from an FCC product stream is separated and delivered to an expander to recover power before combustion.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/18 (2006.01); F01K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 11/182 (2013.01); C10G 11/185 (2013.01); F01K 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR HU IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022838 A1 20090211; BR PI0802436 A2 20091020; CO 6110134 A1 20091231; MX 2008009844 A 20090227

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170201

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR HU IT

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS