Global Patent Index - EP 2022852 A1

EP 2022852 A1 2009-02-11 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE AMINE COMPOUND, RECOMBINANT VECTOR, AND TRANSFORMANT CARRYING THE VECTOR

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF OPTICALLY ACTIVE AMINE COMPOUND, RECOMBINANT VECTOR, AND TRANSFORMANT CARRYING THE VECTOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER OPTISCH AKTIVEN AMINVERBINDUNG, REKOMBINANTER VEKTOR UND DEN VEKTOR TRAGENDE TRANSFORMANTE

Title (fr)

MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSÉ AMINE OPTIQUEMENT ACTIF, D'UN VECTEUR RECOMBINANT ET D'UN TRANSFORMANT PORTANT LEDIT VECTEUR

Publication

EP 2022852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07744240 A

Priority

  • JP 2007060806 W
  • JP 2006148623 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a method for producing an optically-active amine compound. The method is characterized by using a transaminase (A), an ±-keto acid reductase (B), and an enzyme (C), each having specific properties, in an identical reaction system to convert a ketone compound into a corresponding optically-active amine compound in which a carbon atom with an amino group bonded thereto serves as an asymmetric point. The present invention also relates to a recombinant vector for use in the method. The present invention makes it possible to efficiently produce an optically-active amine compound.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 9/04 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12P 13/00 (2006.01); C12P 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12P 13/008 (2013.01); C12N 9/0004 (2013.01); C12N 9/0006 (2013.01); C12N 9/1096 (2013.01); C12P 13/001 (2013.01); C12P 13/002 (2013.01); C12P 17/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022852 A1 20090211; EP 2022852 A4 20091104; EP 2022852 B1 20170705; EP 2022852 B8 20170823; JP 5410089 B2 20140205; JP WO2007139055 A1 20091008; US 2009148899 A1 20090611; US 8168412 B2 20120501; WO 2007139055 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-05-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-04-30 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007051545

2018-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171006

2018-02-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171005

2018-02-28 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-02-28 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171105

2018-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2018-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170705

2017-11-27 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2017-11-08 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20170705

2017-08-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007051545

2017-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KANEKA CORPORATION

2017-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2017-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 906630 T

- Effective date: 20170715

2017-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RAPISARDI INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SA, CH

2017-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-07-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-03-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170227

2017-01-04 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2016-09-14 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160816

2016-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 9/02 20060101AFI20160704BHEP

2016-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 9/10 20060101ALI20160704BHEP

2016-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12P 17/10 20060101ALI20160704BHEP

2016-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12N 9/04 20060101ALI20160704BHEP

2016-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12P 13/00 20060101ALI20160704BHEP

2016-07-04 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602007051545

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C12N0015000000

- IPC: C12N0009020000

2015-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150616

2013-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KANEKA CORPORATION

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-11-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091006

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS