Global Patent Index - EP 2022865 A1

EP 2022865 A1 2009-02-11 - ULTRAHIGH STRENGTH STEEL SHEET AND STRENGTH PART FOR AUTOMOBILE UTILIZING THE SAME

Title (en)

ULTRAHIGH STRENGTH STEEL SHEET AND STRENGTH PART FOR AUTOMOBILE UTILIZING THE SAME

Title (de)

ULTRAHOCHFESTES STAHLBLECH UND FESTIGKEITSTEIL FÜR AUTO DAMIT

Title (fr)

TÔLE D'ACIER DE TRÈS HAUTE RÉSISTANCE ET PIÈCE DE RENFORT POUR AUTOMOBILE L'UTILISANT

Publication

EP 2022865 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07740860 A

Priority

  • JP 2007057424 W
  • JP 2006137225 A
  • JP 2006137226 A
  • JP 2006137227 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided an ultrahigh strength steel sheet containing 0.10 to 0.40 mass% of C, 0.01 to 3.5 mass% of Cr, at least one selected from the group consisting of 0.10 to 2.0 mass% of Mo, 0.20 to 1.5 mass% of W, 0.002 to 1.0 mass% of V, 0.002 to 1.0 mass% of Ti and 0.005 to 1.0 mass% of Nb, 0.02 mass% or less of P and 0.01 mass% or less of S as impurities and the balance being Fe and unavoidable impurities based on the total mass of the steel sheet and having a base structure of lower bainite, a prior austenite grain size of 30 µm or smaller and a tensile strength of 980 MPa or higher. There is also provided an automotive strength part using the ultrahigh strength steel sheet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/28 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/02 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007132600A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022865 A1 20090211; US 2009236015 A1 20090924; WO 2007132600 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151103

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081016

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS