Global Patent Index - EP 2022880 A1

EP 2022880 A1 2009-02-11 - Needle holder

Title (en)

Needle holder

Title (de)

Nadelhalterung

Title (fr)

Porte-aiguille

Publication

EP 2022880 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07014179 A

Priority

EP 07014179 A

Abstract (en)

A needle-receiver (2) has a seat that accommodates a needle end (7). A needle clamp (8) is connected to the needle-receiver. The clamp moves between a clamping position and a release position. A movable clamp holder moves between a fixing position, in which it holds the needle clamp in the clamping position, and a release position, in which it releases the needle clamp. The fixer slides or moves away from the needle clamp or to the needle-receiver.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schnellspannhalter für eine Nähnadel, Sticknadel oder dergleichen weist eine Nadelaufnahme (2) auf, an der ein Nadelklemmteil (8) vorzugsweise schwenkbar gelagert ist. Zum Festspannen und Fixieren des Nadelklemmteils (8) in Klemmposition ist ein Fixierelement (14) vorgesehen, das bezüglich einer Längsmittelachse (13) der Nadel schwenkbar oder drehbar gelagert ist und somit auf das Nadelklemmteil (8) aufgeschoben und von diesem herunter geschoben werden kann. Die Betätigung ist einfach und sicher.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 55/02 (2006.01); D05C 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 55/02 (2013.01); D05C 11/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022880 A1 20090211; EP 2022880 B1 20100317; AT 461305 T 20100415; CN 101348975 A 20090121; CN 101348975 B 20121114; DE 502007003160 D1 20100429; JP 2009024325 A 20090205; JP 5094608 B2 20121212; KR 101071655 B1 20111011; KR 20090009119 A 20090122; TW 200934908 A 20090816; TW I373539 B 20121001; US 2009020055 A1 20090122; US 7971544 B2 20110705

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101220

2010-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003160 P 20100429

2010-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE S.A.

2010-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI TR

2009-11-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HILLENBRAND, BERND

2009-11-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAUG, KAI UWE

2009-11-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAAS, TIMO

2009-11-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER, FRED

2009-11-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAESCHLE, ROLAND

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI TR

2009-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090508

2009-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090324

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS