Global Patent Index - EP 2022891 A2

EP 2022891 A2 2009-02-11 - Press device

Title (en)

Press device

Title (de)

Pressanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de presse

Publication

EP 2022891 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08154357 A

Priority

DE 102007035548 A

Abstract (en)

A press for removing moisture from a fiber band, e.g. paper, card, paper tissue etc., has the band passed through at least two press stages supported between water absorbing pressure bands (2, 3, 4). The initial press stage gas a length of between 150 and 500 mm while the last press stage has a length of less than 250 mm. The peak pressure exerted by the first press stage is less than that applied by the last press stage but with a greater tension in the first stage. The stages include special rollers (7, 10) with flexible covers and concave sections for optimum water removal.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Pressanordnung zur Entwässerung einer Papier-, Karton-, Tissue- oder einer anderen Faserstoffbahn (1) in einer Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Veredlung derselben mit zumindest zwei Pressspalten, von denen wenigstens der erste verlängert ausgeführt ist und eine Länge von wenigstens 100 mm hat, wobei der erste Pressspalt in Bahnlaufrichtung (14) länger als der letzte Pressspalt ausgebildet ist und die Faserstoffbahn (1) gemeinsam mit zumindest einem wasseraufnehmenden Entwässerungsband (2,3,4) durch die Pressspalte läuft. Dabei soll eine volumenschonende Entwässerung bei möglichst ebenen Feuchtequerprofil dadurch erreicht werden, dass die Linienlast im ersten Pressspalt höher als im letzten Pressspalt und der Spitzendruck im ersten Pressspalt geringer als im letzten Pressspalt ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/0209 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022891 A2 20090211; EP 2022891 A3 20121226; DE 102007035548 A1 20090129

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140218

2013-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20130626

2013-08-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-12-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-12-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 3/04 20060101ALI20121120BHEP

2012-12-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 3/02 20060101AFI20121120BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS