Global Patent Index - EP 2022892 A2

EP 2022892 A2 2009-02-11 - Construction group with calender and drying device

Title (en)

Construction group with calender and drying device

Title (de)

Baugruppe mit Kalander und Trockenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Bloc doté d'une calendre et d'un dispositif de séchage

Publication

EP 2022892 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08160375 A

Priority

DE 102007034098 A

Abstract (en)

The paper machine assembly comprises a drying unit (3), a calander unit (2) and a belt system (7) which supports the web (5) on at least one side. The drying and calander units share at least one belt.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Baugruppe (1) für Papiermaschinen vorgeschlagen, die eine Kalandervorrichtung (2) und eine Trockenvorrichtung (3) aufweist. Kalandervorrichtung (3) und Trockenvorrichtung (2) weisen zumindest eine gemeinsame Bandeinrichtung (7) auf.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21F 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022892 A2 20090211; EP 2022892 A3 20131023; DE 102007034098 A1 20090122

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-07 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20140702

2014-07-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-07-02 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2014-07-02 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2013-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21G 1/00 20060101ALI20130913BHEP

2013-10-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 5/00 20060101AFI20130913BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS