Global Patent Index - EP 2022904 A1

EP 2022904 A1 2009-02-11 - System for erecting a glass block wall, at least partially curved

Title (en)

System for erecting a glass block wall, at least partially curved

Title (de)

System zum Errichten einer zumindest teilweise gekrümmten Wand aus Glasbausteinen

Title (fr)

Systemé d'élévation d'une paroi de blocs de verre, au moins partiellement courbe

Publication

EP 2022904 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08013130 A

Priority

FR 0705336 A

Abstract (en)

The system has inserted vertical plastic profiles (3) comprising longitudinal wings (6) close to end zones of one of side surfaces (4, 5) of the profiles. The wings are fixed on the surfaces to obtain an angular shift of determined value between two series of successive glass blocks (2) for forming a partially curved wall (1) along chosen radius. The wings are fixed on one of the end zones of the surfaces by an assembling unit i.e. dovetail mortise, that permits the removal and interchange of the wing to adapt the wings of different dimensions based on radius of curvature.

Abstract (fr)

Système d'élévation d'une paroi (1) à partir de blocs de verre (2), du type mettant en oeuvre des profilés intercalaires (3) en matière plastique disposés au montage entre les chants verticaux et/ou horizontaux de deux blocs successifs (2), caractérisé en ce qu'au moins l'un des profilés verticaux et/ou horizontaux présente, à proximité d'une zone d'extrémité d'au moins l'une de ses faces latérales (4,5), une ailette longitudinale (6), réalisée ou rapportée sur celle-ci, de manière à obtenir un décalage angulaire, de valeur déterminée, entre au moins deux séries de blocs successifs (2), pour la réalisation d'une paroi (1) au moins partiellement courbe selon un rayon (r) choisi.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/42 (2006.01); E04C 2/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 1/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2872839 A1 20060113 - ALTIVER SARL [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022904 A1 20090211; FR 2919316 A1 20090130; FR 2919316 B1 20130906

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100316

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090807

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS