Global Patent Index - EP 2022908 A1

EP 2022908 A1 2009-02-11 - Bulkhead formwork

Title (en)

Bulkhead formwork

Title (de)

Stirnabschalung

Title (fr)

Coffrage frontal

Publication

EP 2022908 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08012243 A

Priority

DE 202007010219 U

Abstract (en)

The bulkhead has a panel-shaped formwork material (2) whose upper free edge (3) is in the form of a support (4) for a reinforcement arrangement. The support has at least one associated positioning recess (6) open to the free edge for the reinforcement arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Stimabschalung für eine Betonplatte, insbesondere für eine Boden- oder Deckenplatte, beschrieben. Die Stimabschalung enthält ein tafelförmiges Schalungsmaterial (2), dessen obere freie Kante (3) als Auflager (4) für eine Bewehrung (5) ausgebildet ist. Um eine einfach handhabbare Stirnabschalung zu schaffen, die trotzdem eine sichere Positionierung einer oberen Bewehrung einer Platte gestattet, wird vorgeschlagen, dem Auflager (4) wenigstens eine zur freien Kante (3) hin offene Positioniervertiefung (6) für die Bewehrung (5) zuzuordnen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/36 (2006.01); E04G 11/08 (2006.01); E04B 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/365 (2013.01); E04B 2005/322 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007010219 U1 20070927; AT 552395 T 20120415; EP 2022908 A1 20090211; EP 2022908 B1 20120404

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-05-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008006841

- Effective date: 20130107

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130107

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008006841

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 552395 T

- Effective date: 20120415

2012-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2012-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2009-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091021

2009-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS