Global Patent Index - EP 2022909 A2

EP 2022909 A2 2009-02-11 - Rope loop store

Title (en)

Rope loop store

Title (de)

Seilschlaufenkasten

Title (fr)

Boite d'attente

Publication

EP 2022909 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08161211 A

Priority

DE 202007010508 U

Abstract (en)

The base (6) has a rope holding element (9), and a rope guiding element (10) with an opening for leading out an end of a rope loop from a rope loop case (1). The rope loop is receivable in a bent condition in the base such that the rope loop is held between the rope guiding element and the rope holding element, where the base, rope guiding element and the rope holding element are formed as a single-piece. The rope guiding element exhibits a wall thickness between 1 millimeter and 5 millimeters, where the base is made of plastic or injectable or deep-drawn material.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Boden (6, 6') für einen Seilschlaufenkasten mit einem Seildurchführungselement (10, 10') mit einer Öffnung zum Herausführen eines Endes einer Seilschlaufe aus einem Seilschlaufenkasten und mit einem Seilhalteelement (9, 9'), wobei der Boden so ausgestaltet ist, daß in ihm eine Seilschlaufe derart aufnehmbar ist, daß diese zwischen dem Seildurchführungselement (10, 10') und dem Seilhalteelement (9, 9') in etwa rechtwinklig abgewinkelt gehalten ist. Um einen einfach und kostengünstig herzustellenden Seilschlaufenkasten bereitzustellen, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß der Boden (6, 6'), das Seildurchführungselement (10, 10') und das Seilhalteelement (9, 9') einstückig ausgeführt sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/125 (2013.01); E04G 21/126 (2013.01); E04G 21/142 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29505789 U1 19960801 - BETOMAX KUNSTSTOFF METALL [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007010508 U1 20081211; EP 2022909 A2 20090211; EP 2022909 A3 20130529; EP 2022909 B1 20171206

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-01-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008015781

2017-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 952516 T

- Effective date: 20171215

2017-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2017-12-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-08-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170711

2016-08-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160726

2014-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2013-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-11-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2013-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-05-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E04G 21/12 20060101AFI20130425BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS