Global Patent Index - EP 2022916 A2

EP 2022916 A2 2009-02-11 - Anti-tipping device

Title (en)

Anti-tipping device

Title (de)

Kippsicherung

Title (fr)

Sécurité contre le renversement

Publication

EP 2022916 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08011348 A

Priority

DE 102007035123 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a locking unit (23) movable relative to a securing unit (25) in a closing position or in a tilting position. The unit (25) has a securing path (73), which (73) runs transverse to an engagement path (71) The locking unit (23) includes sash lock (43) is pivoted between a locking position and an opening position in the closing position of the locking unit, to bring the sash lock selectively in contact and not in contact with the path (71). The unit (23) is movable along the path (73) in the locking position, when the unit (23) is moved between the closing and tilting positions.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kippsicherung für einen Fensterflügel oder Türflügel, mit einer Sicherungseinheit und einer Verriegelungseinheit, die relativ zu der Sicherungseinheit wahlweise in eine Schließstellung oder in eine Kippstellung bringbar ist, welche Sicherungseinheit eine Eingriffsbahn und eine Sicherungsbahn aufweist, die in die Eingriffsbahn mündet und quer zu dieser verläuft, welche Verriegelungseinheit einen Drehriegel aufweist, der in der Schließstellung der Verriegelungseinheit zumindest zwischen einer Verriegelungsstellung und einer Freigabestellung schwenkbar ist, um den Drehriegel wahlweise in Eingriff oder außer Eingriff mit der Eingriffsbahn der Sicherungseinheit zu bringen, wobei in der Verriegelungsstellung der Drehriegel der Verriegelungseinheit entlang der Sicherungsbahn der Sicherungseinheit verfahrbar ist, wenn die Verriegelungseinheit zwischen der Schließstellung und der Kippstellung bewegt wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/1875 (2013.01); E05C 17/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022916 A2 20090211; EP 2022916 A3 20110803; DE 102007035123 A1 20090129

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 9/18 20060101AFI20120410BHEP

2012-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/00 20060101ALI20120410BHEP

2012-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20120203

2011-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-08-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-08-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05C 17/04 20060101AFI20110627BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS