Global Patent Index - EP 2022918 A2

EP 2022918 A2 2009-02-11 - Hinge and manufacturing method therefor

Title (en)

Hinge and manufacturing method therefor

Title (de)

Scharnier und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Charnière et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2022918 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014054 A

Priority

DE 102007037161 A

Abstract (en)

The hinge has two strip halves provided with reels (Ra-Rc) and hinge straps (L1-L3), where one of strip halves is an edge part and/or frame part and another strip half is a door part and/or wing part. The reels are welded in different positions at the hinge straps using laser welding process, where the reels and the straps are made of different material. Wall thicknesses of the reels and the straps are different, where the wall thickness of the reels is larger than the thickness of the straps. The reels are formed as cold formed parts. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a hinge.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Scharnier mit einer ersten und einer zweiten Bandhälfte, wobei die eine erste Bandhälfte ein Zargen- bzw. Rahmenteil und die andere zweite Bandhälfte ein Tür- bzw. Flügelteil ist, wobei zumindest eine Bandhälfte (B ii ) mindestens eine Bandrolle (R i ) und einen Bandlappen (L i ) hat, wobei die mindestens eine Bandrolle (R i ) an dem Bandlappen (L i ) mittels Laserschweißverfahren angeschweißt ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 9/00 (2013.01); E05D 5/06 (2013.01); E05D 5/04 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/54 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022918 A2 20090211; EP 2022918 A3 20090603; DE 102007037161 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100724

2010-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100113

2010-02-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-01-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091203

2009-06-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-06-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS