Global Patent Index - EP 2022921 A1

EP 2022921 A1 2009-02-11 - Device for fixing a glassholder of the screw and nut type

Title (en)

Device for fixing a glassholder of the screw and nut type

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für einen Mitnehmer einer Fensterscheibe bestehend aus Schraubenmuttern und Schrauben

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'une pièce à un support, tel qu'une vitre, du type à ècrou et vis

Publication

EP 2022921 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07290939 A

Priority

EP 07290939 A

Abstract (en)

The device (1) has a clamping bolt and a wallet shaped nut with a base portion (6) pre-mounted on an edge of a support e.g. glass, and a part in a form of a shutter (8) pivoted between opened and closed positions of the nut. The shutter comprises a locking tab (21) and a hooking element (23) to lock the shutter on U-shaped elements in the closed position. The elements comprise two reinforcement arms (14) in which each arm is arranged with a predetermined distance to top of another edge (16) of a bottom plate (12), and a ring washer (26) is made of elastically deformable material.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de fixation d'une pièce à un support tel qu'une vitre, du type comprenant un écrou (1) susceptible d'être prémonté sur le bord du support et une vis de fixation de ladite pièce à ce support. Le dispositif est caractérisé en ce que l'écrou (1) présente une configuration en forme d'un portefeuille comportant une partie de base (6) adaptée pour être montée sur le bord du support et une partie en forme d'un volet (8) pivotant entre une position ouverte de l'écrou et une position fermée dans laquelle le volet (8) est verrouillé sur la partie de base (6). L'invention est utilisable pour la fixation d'un mécanisme de levage et de descente d'une vitre d'une porte d'un véhicule automobile.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05F 2011/387 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022921 A1 20090211; EP 2022921 B1 20100512; EP 2022921 B2 20140813; DE 602007006473 D1 20100624

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-09-18 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602007006473

- Effective date: 20140813

2014-08-13 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20140813

2014-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2014-08-13 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 602007006473

2013-04-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ARAYMOND ET CIE.

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-03-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ARAYMOND ET CIE.

- Effective date: 20110128

2010-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007006473 P 20100624

2010-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS