Global Patent Index - EP 2022926 A2

EP 2022926 A2 2009-02-11 - Holding band for a lamellae hanging

Title (en)

Holding band for a lamellae hanging

Title (de)

Halteband für einen Lamellenbehang

Title (fr)

Bande de maintien d'un rideau de lamelles

Publication

EP 2022926 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08405131 A

Priority

CH 12102007 A

Abstract (en)

The strap (1) has a metal band (3) i.e. steel band, including a retaining part (5) that is connected with the metal band by a riveted bolt (7), in a rotationally secure manner. The metal band comprises serrations (9) in asteroidal shape or intersecting in an area of the retaining part. Indentations (11) are defined by the serrations and formed in such a manner that the indentations protrude from a strap section. A crimp (13) or a stamped part is formed at the metal band in an area of joints on the retaining part. The retaining part is formed as a plastic part or a pressure die casting part. An independent claim is also included for a method for manufacturing a retaining strap.

Abstract (de)

Das Halteband (1) zum Halten von Lamellen eines Behangs, umfasst ein Metallband (3) mit Halteteilen (5), die mittels je eines Niets (7) verdrehsicher mit dem Metallband (3) verbunden sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2006.01); E06B 9/34 (2006.01); E06B 9/384 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/17 (2013.01); E06B 9/34 (2013.01); E06B 9/384 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022926 A2 20090211; EP 2022926 A3 20101215

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160623

2016-03-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160212

2016-02-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/34 20060101ALI20160120BHEP

2016-02-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/384 20060101ALI20160120BHEP

2016-02-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/17 20060101AFI20160120BHEP

2015-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150616

2011-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-06-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20110513

2010-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2010-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/17 20060101AFI20081029BHEP

2010-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/384 20060101ALI20101109BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS