Global Patent Index - EP 2022929 A2

EP 2022929 A2 2009-02-11 - Hanging and fixing device and method of connecting the tapes of a hanging

Title (en)

Hanging and fixing device and method of connecting the tapes of a hanging

Title (de)

Behang sowie Befestigungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verbinden von Bändern eines Behangs

Title (fr)

Rideau ainsi que dispositif de fixation et procédé de liaison de bandes d'un rideau

Publication

EP 2022929 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08405132 A

Priority

CH 12112007 A

Abstract (en)

The hanging has multiple plates (3) or bars with horizontal aligned longitudinal edges, where the plates or bars are connected with belts (11) that are aligned orthogonal to the longitudinal edges of the plates or bars. The belts exhibit upper ends, where a part of upper ends of the belts is held at a traction profile (7) that is aligned parallel to the longitudinal edges of the plates or bars, directly or using carrier units (13). A coupling device (8) is formed at the traction profile for producing a removable connection with a winding shaft. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a fastening device for connecting belts with a winding shaft, comprising a traction profile (2) a method for connecting belts of a hanging with a winding shaft.

Abstract (de)

Zum Befestigen des Behangs eines Stores (1) an einer Aufzugswelle werden die Bänder (11) mit einer mindestens ein Zugprofil (7) umfassenden Befestigungsvorrichtung verbunden. Dies kann bereits vor der Montage des Behangs geschehen. Mittels der Befestigungsvorrichtung kann der vorkonfektionierte Behang einfach an der Aufzugswelle montiert werden. Bei Lamellenstores umfasst die Befestigungsvorrichtung vorzugsweise ein am Zugprofil (7) verschiebbar gehaltenes Tragprofil (9), welches in Kombination mit dem Zugprofil (7) ein Verschwenken der Lamellen (3) ermöglicht.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022929 A2 20090211; EP 2022929 A3 20131016

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20171005

2016-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160321

2014-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140414

2014-06-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-10-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-10-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/34 20060101AFI20130906BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS