Global Patent Index - EP 2022930 A2

EP 2022930 A2 2009-02-11 - Slatted blind and method of connecting the slats with tapes of the blind

Title (en)

Slatted blind and method of connecting the slats with tapes of the blind

Title (de)

Lamellenbehang sowie Verfahren zum Verbinden von Lamellen mit Bändern des Behangs

Title (fr)

Store à lamelles et procédé de liaison de lamelles aux bandes du store

Publication

EP 2022930 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08405133 A

Priority

CH 12122007 A

Abstract (en)

The hanging has multiple lamellas (3) with longitudinal edges arranged parallel to each other. Multiple strips (11) are arranged orthogonal to the longitudinal edges of the lamellas. Connecting parts (14) are formed at the lamellas, and retaining parts (10) are formed adjacent to the connecting parts. A bolt (12) removably connects the connecting parts with the adjacent retaining parts. The connecting parts and/or retaining parts include an elastic spring region for rest-and snap connection. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a device for connecting a lamella with a strip of a hanging (2) a method for connecting a lamella with a strip of a hanging.

Abstract (de)

Die Lamellen (3) des Behangs eines Stores (1) sind an orthogonal zu den Längskanten der Lamellen (3) ausgerichteten Bändern (11) wieder lösbar und schwenkbar mittels Schnapp- oder Rastverbindungen gehalten. An den Lamellen (3) sind für diesen Zweck Verbindungsteile (14) mit parallel zu den Längskanten ausgerichteten Lagern (16) oder vorstehenden Bolzen (12) ausgebildet. Die Verbindungsteile (14) können hebelartig ausgebildet sein und zwei Lager (16) bzw. Bolzen (12) für die Verbindung mit zwei relativ zueinander in Bandrichtung verschiebbaren Bändern (12) umfassen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022930 A2 20090211; EP 2022930 A3 20131002; EP 2022930 B1 20180404; ES 2671704 T3 20180608

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2671704 T3

- Effective date: 20180608

2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-05-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-04-26 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008016004

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 985792 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-04-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2018-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-11-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171108

2016-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160314

2014-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-05-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140402

2014-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2013-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 9/34 20060101AFI20130826BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS