Global Patent Index - EP 2022931 A2

EP 2022931 A2 2009-02-11 - Ladder lock, in particular for children's loft beds

Title (en)

Ladder lock, in particular for children's loft beds

Title (de)

Leitersicherung, insbesondere für Kinderhochbetten

Title (fr)

Fermeture d'échelle, en particulier pour lits surélevés pour enfants

Publication

EP 2022931 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013087 A

Priority

DE 202007010187 U

Abstract (en)

A ladder (10) has a guiding device (2) for a front part (1), which, when pushed up, is kept by a stop (4) or by a fastening device at a level covering the ladder's rungs (11). Fitted vertically and/or horizontally on the ladder, the guiding device is formed by a protruding profiled rail with an undercut.

Abstract (de)

Eine Leitersicherung, insbesondere für eine Kinderhochbettleiter mit einem Frontteil (1), das auf die Vorderseite der Leiter (10) auflegbar ist, zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass die Leiter (10) zumindest eine Führung (2) für das Frontteil (1) aufweist und dass das Frontteil (1) in aufgeschobenem Zustand durch einen Anschlag (4) oder durch eine Fixierung auf einem die Sprossen (11) der Leiter abdeckenden Niveau gehalten wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 1/005 (2013.01); E06C 7/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007010187 U1 20080828; DE 202008009810 U1 20081016; EP 2022931 A2 20090211; EP 2022931 A3 20110105

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-10-27 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110907

2011-09-07 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-09-07 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS