Global Patent Index - EP 2022934 A2

EP 2022934 A2 2009-02-11 - Method of evaluating a production scheme of an underground reservoir, taking into account uncertainties

Title (en)

Method of evaluating a production scheme of an underground reservoir, taking into account uncertainties

Title (de)

Methode zur Evaluierung eines Produktionsschemas von unterirdischen Quellvorkommen unter Berücksichtigung von Unsicherheitsfaktoren

Title (fr)

Méthode pour évaluer un schéma de production d'un gisement souterrain en tenant compte des incertitudes

Publication

EP 2022934 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 08290725 A

Priority

FR 0705740 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves calculating precision degree of predictions of an approached analytic model i.e. response surface. An experimental design is constructed to select simulations to be realized for adjusting the model. The selected simulations are realized using an outflow simulator, and the model is adjusted for response simulated by the simulator using an approximation method to adjust responses predicted by the model with respect to the responses simulated by the simulator. The calculation of precision degree is restarted until the desired precision degree is attained. The construction of the design, the realization of simulations and the calculation of precision degree are performed, if the precision degree is higher than the desired prediction degree.

Abstract (fr)

Méthode pour évaluer un schéma de production d'un gisement souterrain en tenant compte des incertitudes. On sélectionne des paramètres d'entrée d'un simulateur d'écoulement, caractérisant le gisement et le schéma de production. On construit un modèle analytique approché permettant de prédire les réponses du gisement. On définit un degré de précision D p que l'on souhaite obtenir, ce degré de précision D p mesurant l'écart entre les réponses du modèle et celles du simulateur. On calcule le degré de précision D p (M) des prédictions du modèle. On construit un plan d'expériences de façon à sélectionner des simulations à réaliser, pertinentes pour ajuster le modèle. On réalise les simulations sélectionnées par le plan d'expérience, puis, pour chacune des réponses simulées par le simulateur, on ajuste le modèle analytique à l'aide d'une méthode d'approximation. On réitère jusqu'à ce que le degré de précision souhaité D p soit atteint. Enfin, on évalue le schéma de production, en analysant les réponses du gisement prédites par le modèle analytique approché. Application notamment à l'exploitation de gisements pétroliers.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 43/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • FR 2874706 A1 20060303 - INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]
  • EP 1484704 A1 20041208 - INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]
  • DROESBEKE J.J ET AL.: "Plans d'expériences, Applications à l'entreprise", 1997
  • A. SALTELLI; K. CHAN; M. SCOTT: "Sensitivity Analysis", 2000, WILEY
  • KENNEDY M.; O'HAGAN A.: "Bayesian calibration of computer models (with discussion", J R. STATIST. SOC. SER. B STAT. METHODOL., vol. 68, 2001, pages 425 - 464
  • SCHEIDT C. ET AL.: "Adaptive Evolutive Experimental Designs for Uncertainty Assessment - An innovative exploitation of geostatistical techniques", IAMG, TORONTO, 21 August 2005 (2005-08-21)
  • BUSBY D.; FARMER C.L.; ISKE A.: "Hierarchical Nonlinear Approximation for Experimental Design and Statistical Data Fitting", SIAM J. SCI. COMPUT., vol. 29, no. 1, 2007, pages 49 - 69
  • SALTELLI, K. CHAN; M. SCOTT: "Sensitivity Analysis", 2000, WILEY
  • OAKLEY; A. O'HAGAN: "Probabilistic sensitivity analysis of complex models: A Bayesian approach", J. ROY. STATIST. SOC. SER. B, vol. 16, 2004, pages 751 - 769
  • LM SOBOL: "Sensitivity estimates for nonlinear mathematical models", MATHEMATICAL MODELLING AND COMPUTATIONAL EXPERIMENTS, vol. 1, 1993, pages 407 - 414
  • M.M. LOÈVE.: "Probability Theory. Princeton", 1955, UNIVERSITY PRESS

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB NO

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022934 A2 20090211; EP 2022934 A3 20110615; CA 2638227 A1 20090206; CA 2638227 C 20160927; FR 2919932 A1 20090213; FR 2919932 B1 20091204; US 2009043555 A1 20090212; US 8392164 B2 20130305

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180425

2017-11-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2012-04-12 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-02-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): GB NO

2012-01-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20111215

2011-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-06-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2011-06-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E21B 43/00 20060101AFI20110512BHEP

2011-05-12 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E21B0041000000

- IPC: E21B0043000000

2010-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS