Global Patent Index - EP 2022966 A2

EP 2022966 A2 2009-02-11 - Pressure monitoring system

Title (en)

Pressure monitoring system

Title (de)

Drucküberwachungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance de la pression

Publication

EP 2022966 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08009371 A

Priority

IT AO20070589 A

Abstract (en)

A pressure monitoring system for a combustion engine comprises a plurality of combustion chambers (2) and a pressure sensors (5) associated to at least some of the combustion chambers (2). A multiplexer (7) has inputs connected to at least a first one and a second one of said pressure sensors (5). A non-zero phase shift exists between the operating cycles of first and second ones of the combustion chambers (2) associated to said first and second pressure sensors (5). A controller (14) controls the multiplexer (7) to output data from the first pressure sensor (5) while the first combustion chamber (2) is in a predetermined portion of its operating cycle and pressure data from the second pressure sensor (5) while the second combustion chamber (2) is in said predetermined portion of its operating cycle.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 35/024 (2013.01); F02D 35/023 (2013.01); F02D 41/28 (2013.01); F02D 2041/281 (2013.01); F02D 2250/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022966 A2 20090211; EP 2022966 A3 20090826

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110914

2011-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: GM GLOBAL TECHNOLOGY OPERATIONS LLC

2010-05-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100226

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS