Global Patent Index - EP 2022969 A2

EP 2022969 A2 2009-02-11 - Method for operating a piezoelectrically actuated injection valve

Title (en)

Method for operating a piezoelectrically actuated injection valve

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines piezoelektrisch betätigten Einspritzventils

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'une soupape d'injection à commande piézoélectrique

Publication

EP 2022969 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104338 A

Priority

DE 102007034188 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves charging an actuator (12) of an injection valve formed as piezoelectric element with a control voltage (U). The actuator is charged in a test control with a predetermined test voltage. A controlled fluid pressure is detected during the test control in a supply system. The test voltage and the detected fluid pressure information are derived over at operating condition of the injection valve (10) or the actuator. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a computer program product (2) a controller for an injection valve, particularly a fuel injection valve of an internal combustion engine of a motor vehicle.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Einspritzventils (10), insbesondere eines Kraftstoffeinspritzventils einer Brennkraftmaschine, bei dem ein als piezoelektrisches Element ausgebildeter Aktor (12) des Einspritzventils (10) mit einer Ansteuerspannung (U) beaufschlagbar ist, um eine Einspritzung von, dem Einspritzventil (10) über ein Zufuhrsystem zugeführtes Fluid, insbesondere Kraftstoff, zu bewirken. Erfindungsgemäß wird der Aktor (12) in einer Testansteuerung mit einer vorgebbaren Testspannung beaufschlagt, und ein in dem Zufuhrsystem herrschender Fluiddruck wird zumindest während der Testansteuerung erfasst, um aus der Testspannung und dem erfassten Fluiddruck Informationen über einen Betriebszustand des Einspritzventils (10) und/oder des Aktors (12) abzuleiten.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 43/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 65/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/2096 (2013.01); F02D 41/2438 (2013.01); F02D 41/2467 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); F02M 65/003 (2013.01); F02D 41/123 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0614 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022969 A2 20090211; EP 2022969 A3 20120704; DE 102007034188 A1 20090129; US 2009045267 A1 20090219; US 7905136 B2 20110315

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130105

2013-05-02 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130313

2013-03-13 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-03-13 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 65/00 20060101ALI20120525BHEP

2012-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02D 41/12 20060101ALN20120525BHEP

2012-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02M 51/06 20060101ALI20120525BHEP

2012-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02D 41/20 20060101AFI20120525BHEP

2012-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02D 41/24 20060101ALI20120525BHEP

2012-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F02D 43/02 20060101ALI20120525BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS