Global Patent Index - EP 2022990 A1

EP 2022990 A1 2009-02-11 - Machine tool and supply unit

Title (en)

Machine tool and supply unit

Title (de)

Werkzeugmaschine und Versorgungsaggregat

Title (fr)

Machine outil et unité d'alimentation

Publication

EP 2022990 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07015527 A

Priority

EP 07015527 A

Abstract (en)

The tool has an electrohydraulic control device, and work hydraulics whose hydro-load is permanently operable with a hydraulic base load and occasionally with a hydraulic peak load. A power unit (A) comprises two constant pumps (P1, P2) with low and high delivery rates in an oil tank (R). The pump with low delivery rate covers the base load, and the pump with high delivery rate covers the peak load. A permanently operable pumps driving motor (M1) is provided for the pump (P1). A pumps driving motor (M2) is provided for the pump (P2) in the power unit.

Abstract (de)

In einer Werkzeugmaschine (M) mit Hydroverbrauchern, die permanent mit einer hydraulischen Grundlast und nur zeitweise mit einer hydraulischen Spitzenlast betreibbar sind, sind eine elektrohydraulische Steuervorrichtung (S) und ein Versorgungsaggregat (A) vorgesehen, wobei das Versorgungsaggregat (A) in einem Ölreservoir (R) wenigstens erste und zweite Konstantpumpen (P1, P2) aufweist und ein erster, permanent betriebener Pumpenantriebsmotor (M1) für zumindest die erste Konstantpumpe (P1) und im selben Ölreservoir (R) für die zweite Konstantpumpe (P2) ein zweiter Pumpenantriebsmotor (M2) vorgesehen sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/17 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/17 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20538 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20584 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50518 (2013.01); F15B 2211/615 (2013.01); F15B 2211/625 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2022990 A1 20090211; EP 2022990 B1 20161012

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2018-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAWE HYDRAULIK SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HAWE HYDRAULIK SE, 81673 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 502007015179

2018-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007015179

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170713

2017-07-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007015179

2016-11-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007015179

2016-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2016-06-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-01-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20151202

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS