Global Patent Index - EP 2023034 A1

EP 2023034 A1 2009-02-11 - Decorative light string.

Title (en)

Decorative light string.

Title (de)

Dekorative Lichterkette

Title (fr)

Chaîne lumineuse décorative

Publication

EP 2023034 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07015568 A

Priority

EP 07015568 A

Abstract (en)

The string has a set of illuminating units connected to an electric cable (1) consisting of two wires (2), which include an insulating layer (3). The illuminating units have a retainer (20) arranged on a base (10). An orientation layer (22) has an illuminating element (30) with a guiding layer (32). The guiding layer is aligned at the orientation layer. The illuminating element is positioned in the retainer. Two spikes for a power supply line, which passes through the retainer, establish an electrical contact with the wires of the electric cable. The base has a three-dimensional form.

Abstract (de)

Dekorative Lichterkette bestehend aus mehreren Leuchteinheiten, die an ein Stromkabel (1) angeschlossen sind, welches aus zwei Adern (2) besteht, die von einer Isolierschicht (3) umfaßt sind, wobei jede der Leuchteinheiten aus einem Sockel (10) mit einem Kanal (11), der durch den Sockel (10) führt und in dem das Stromkabel (1) durchgeführt ist; aus einem Halter (20), der auf dem Sockel (10) angeordnet ist und der eine Orientierungsebene (22) besitzt; aus einem Leuchtelement (30), das eine Führungsebene (32), die an die Orientierungsebene (22) angepaßt ist und mittels derer das Leuchtelement (30) in dem Halter (20) positioniert ist und zwei Stifte (31) zur Stromleitung, die durch den Halter (20) gehen und jeweils einen elektrischen Kontakt zu den zwei Adern (2) des Stromkabels (1) herstellen, aufweist, besteht.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 4/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/002 (2006.01); F21W 121/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2404 (2013.01); F21S 4/10 (2016.01); F21V 21/002 (2013.01); H01R 33/09 (2013.01); F21W 2121/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023034 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130301

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-09-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS