Global Patent Index - EP 2023056 A1

EP 2023056 A1 2009-02-11 - Binding process for an air heater and structure thereof

Title (en)

Binding process for an air heater and structure thereof

Title (de)

Bindungsverfahren für einen Lufterhitzer und dessen Struktur

Title (fr)

Procédé de liaison pour un chauffage d'air et structure de celui-ci

Publication

EP 2023056 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07014934 A

Priority

EP 07014934 A

Abstract (en)

A binding process for an air heater and structure thereof, in particular a heater having application in air, in which various modularized prefabricated units are used to assemble and enable subsequent binding and rapid production of the heater. An electric conduction test is simultaneously implemented during the binding process, which enables accelerating the speed of solidification of a binding material and avoids a baking energy load. The present invention is able to withstand a relatively large assembly clamping pressure during the binding process, and achieves a substantially large secure mechanical force fit between the components after completing assembly that provides good conducting physical properties.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/04 (2006.01); B29C 65/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/0405 (2013.01); F24H 9/1872 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1515587 A1 20050316 - CATEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023056 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120201

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090907

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS