Global Patent Index - EP 2023062 A2

EP 2023062 A2 2009-02-11 - Refrigeration and/or freezer device

Title (en)

Refrigeration and/or freezer device

Title (de)

Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de réfrigération et/ou de refroidissement

Publication

EP 2023062 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013375 A

Priority

DE 202007010400 U

Abstract (en)

The device for producing and crushing ice-cubes in a refrigerating and/or freezing appliance has a unit (10) for producing ice-cubes, and also a unit (20) for crushing the ice-cubes, with both units being arranged in a common sub-assembly (100). A transporting means are accommodated in the sub-assembly and are constructed and arranged in such a way that the ice-cubes are transported from the production unit to the crushing unit. An independent claim is included for a refrigerating and/or freezing appliance with the aforesaid device for producing and crushing ice-cubes.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Herstellung und Zerkleinerung von Eiswürfeln in einem Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät mit einer Herstelleinheit (10) zur Herstellung von Eiswürfeln sowie mit einer Zerkleinerungseinheit (20) zur Zerkleinerung der in der Herstelleinheit (10) hergestellten Eiswürfel, wobei die Herstelleinheit (10) und die Zerkleinerungseinheit (20) in einer gemeinsamen Baugruppe (100) angeordnet sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25C 5/04 (2006.01); F25C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25C 5/046 (2013.01); F25C 5/22 (2018.01); F25C 2400/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007010400 U1 20081204; EP 2023062 A2 20090211; EP 2023062 A3 20150422; US 2009255289 A1 20091015

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180620

2015-12-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2015-12-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2015-12-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2015-12-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2015-12-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2015-12-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-04-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2015-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25C 5/00 20060101ALI20150317BHEP

2015-04-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25C 5/04 20060101AFI20150317BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25C 5/04 20060101AFI20141118BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25C 5/00 20060101ALI20141118BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS