Global Patent Index - EP 2023065 A2

EP 2023065 A2 2009-02-11 - Refrigeration and/or freezer device

Title (en)

Refrigeration and/or freezer device

Title (de)

Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de réfrigération et/ou de refroidissement

Publication

EP 2023065 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013453 A

Priority

  • DE 202007010401 U
  • DE 202007013169 U

Abstract (en)

Refrigerator and/or freezer comprises a release unit or a component (10) for holding the release unit having a first section which is connected to a first structure of a door and a second section which is connected to a second structure of a door. Preferred Features: The first and second sections are formed by surfaces running parallel to the door. The first and second sections are displaced from each other in the depth direction. A safety device is also provided for fixing the release unit or the component to the door.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät mit wenigstens einer Tür (30) sowie mit wenigstens einer in der Tür angeordneten Ausgabeeinheit, mittels derer Waren, insbesondere Eis und/oder Wasser ausgebbar sind, wobei die Ausgabeeinheit oder ein Bauteil (20) zur Aufnahme der Ausgabeeinheit einen ersten Abschnitt aufweist, der mit einer ersten Ausführung einer Tür (30) verbindbar ist oder in Verbindung steht, und einen zweiten Abschnitt aufweist, der mit einer zweiten Ausführung einer Tür (32) verbindbar ist oder in Verbindung steht.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/126 (2013.01); F25D 23/028 (2013.01); F25C 2400/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202007013169 U1 20081204; EP 2023065 A2 20090211; EP 2023065 A3 20150826; US 2009031752 A1 20090205; US 8763421 B2 20140701

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JENDRUSCH, HOLGER

2018-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DORNER, GEORG

2018-07-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRIEDMANN, VOLKER

2018-07-04 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180605

2016-05-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2016-05-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2016-05-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2016-05-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2016-05-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2016-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160225

2015-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-08-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2015-08-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F25D 23/12 20060101AFI20150717BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS