Global Patent Index - EP 2023070 A1

EP 2023070 A1 2009-02-11 - Regenerative heat exchanger and radial seal for use for such and method for separating gaseous media in a regenerative heat exchanger

Title (en)

Regenerative heat exchanger and radial seal for use for such and method for separating gaseous media in a regenerative heat exchanger

Title (de)

Regenerativ-Wärmeaustauscher und Radialdichtung zur Verwendung für einen solchen sowie Verfahren zum Trennen von gasförmigen Medien in einem regenerativ-Wärmeaustauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur thermique régénératif, joint radial destiné à l'utilisation pour celui-ci et procédé destiné à la séparation de milieux gazeux dans un échangeur thermique régénératif

Publication

EP 2023070 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07014528 A

Priority

EP 07014528 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger has a rotor (10) comprising a set of radially running sector walls (12). Heat accumulator chambers (19) are arranged one behind the other in a radial direction of the rotor and through-flowable by a gaseous medium. The chambers comprise openings formed in an area of front surfaces of the rotor, and a radial seal (20) is arranged at the front surfaces of the rotor, where the seal and the rotor are rotatable relative to each other. The radial seal is designed in such a manner that the seal partially covers the opening during the operation of the heat exchanger. An independent claim is also included for a method for separating gaseous medium in a regenerative-heat exchanger.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Regenerativ-Wärmetauscher zum Wärmetausch von gasförmigen Medien mit einem im Wesentlichen zylindrischen Wärmespeicherkörper (10). Ferner betrifft die Erfindung eine Radialdichtung zur Verwendung in einem Regenerativ-Wärmetauscher sowie ein Verfahren zum Trennen von gasförmigen Medien in einem Regenerativ-Wärmetauscher. Der Wärmespeicherkörper des Regenerativ-Wärmetauschers weist eine Vielzahl von radial verlaufenden Sektorwänden (12) auf, die den Wärmespeicherkörper in Sektoren (15) aufteilen. Innerhalb eines Sektors sind mindestens zwei in Radialrichtung hintereinander angeordnete Wärmespeicherkammern (19) vorgesehen, die zum Durchströmen der gasförmigen Medien ausgebildet sind. Ferner sind zur Trennung der Gasströme Radialdichtungen (20) an den Stirnflächen des Wärmespeicherkörpers angeordnet, die Abdeckflächen für die Wärmespeicherkammern bilden und die Wärmespeicherkammern während des Betriebes des Regenerativ-Wärmetauschers wechselweise abdecken, wobei die Radialdichtungen und der Wärmespeicherkörper relativ zueinander verdrehbar sind. Um das Auftreten von Schwingungen zu vermeiden, die durch die im Wärmespeicherkörper zwischen den einzelnen Gasbereichen herrschenden Druckunterschiede hervorgerufen werden, sind die Radialdichtungen so ausgebildet, dass sie von den radial hintereinander angeordneten Wärmespeicherkammern eines Sektors in jeder Drehstellung die Öffnung mindestens einer Wärmespeicherkammer höchstens teilweise abdecken.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 19/047 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023070 A1 20090211; EP 2023070 B1 20110504; AT 508337 T 20110515; CN 101373122 A 20090225; CN 101373122 B 20120718; DE 502007007132 D1 20110616; DK 2023070 T3 20110711; HK 1128191 A1 20130208; PT 2023070 E 20110630; RU 2008130532 A 20100127; RU 2395051 C2 20100720; SI 2023070 T1 20110930; US 2009056908 A1 20090305; US 8561672 B2 20131022; ZA 200806464 B 20100728

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-11-30 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20170907

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20170904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170911

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20170906

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20170927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20170904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20170904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170826

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 508337 T

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110724

2012-05-31 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007007132

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120207

2012-02-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-12-30 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-12-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E011913

2011-11-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-11-30 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110904

2011-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110504

2011-10-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2011-10-04 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 9709

2011-08-30 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20110401448

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-08-17 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2011-08-02 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2363375 T3

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-07-14 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2011-07-11 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2011-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007007132

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007007132 P 20110616

2011-05-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2011-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-04-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090306

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS