Global Patent Index - EP 2023072 A1

EP 2023072 A1 2009-02-11 - Set of pellets for armor protection

Title (en)

Set of pellets for armor protection

Title (de)

Pellet-Satz für Panzerschutz

Title (fr)

Ensemble de granules pour protection du blindage

Publication

EP 2023072 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07015705 A

Priority

EP 07015705 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to pellets for armor protection, such as armor plates and panels. The pellets are particularly made of ceramics material and are arranged in sets of pellets, each set comprising a plurality of interconnected and integrally formed pellets (1). In a preferred embodiment, the pellets (1) are integrally formed individually and/or in groups before the sintering or during sintering. Preferably, the set comprises any linear, planar and or three-dimensional arrangement of pellets.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/0492 (2013.01); F41H 5/0428 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] EP 1734332 A2 20061220 - PLASAN SASA LTD [IL]
  • [X] DE 102005053594 A1 20070516 - PARTHY KAI [DE]
  • [X] US 4179979 A 19791225 - COOK RICHARD L [US], et al
  • [Y] TANAKA HIDEHIKO ET AL: "Development of Advanced Non-Oxide Ceramic Materials", NIMS NOW INTERNATIONAL, vol. 5, no. 3, 1 March 2007 (2007-03-01), Tsukuba, Japan, XP002463261, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://www.nims.go.jp/eng/news/nimsnow/Vol5/No3/p3.html> [retrieved on 20071221]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023072 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-11-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090505

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080414

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS