Global Patent Index - EP 2023073 A1

EP 2023073 A1 2009-02-11 - Shaft head for speargun

Title (en)

Shaft head for speargun

Title (de)

Schaftkopf für ein Speergewehr

Title (fr)

Tête de harpon pour fusil sous-marin

Publication

EP 2023073 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07425524 A

Priority

EP 07425524 A

Abstract (en)

A shaft head for a speargun, comprising at least one tip (2) and at least one barb (3) which is pivoted so that it can rotate about a substantially transverse axis of rotation from a closed configuration, in which it is substantially adjacent to the head (1), to an open configuration, in which it is adapted to retain the prey; the head further comprises retention means (4), which are detachably engageable with at least one free end (5) of the barb (3), and the retention means (4) are movable from a configuration for locking the barb (3) in the closed configuration to a configuration for disengaging the free end (5) so as to allow the opening of the barb (3), at least the free end (5) having a shape and dimensions which are substantially complementary to those of a respective receptacle (6) provided on the head (1), so as to provide minimum space occupation following the engagement of the free end (5) in the receptacle (6) with consequent optimum hydrodynamic behavior of the shaft (A).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 6/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 6/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023073 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-11-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2009-06-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PISELLO, MARCO

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS