Global Patent Index - EP 2023229 A1

EP 2023229 A1 2009-02-11 - Operating unit

Title (en)

Operating unit

Title (de)

Bedieneinheit

Title (fr)

Unité de commande

Publication

EP 2023229 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104771 A

Priority

DE 102007035892 A

Abstract (en)

The operating unit (10) has an operating element (12) pivoted about a rotating axis (16) and a surface unit (22), which limits the operating area (24) of the operating element touched to an operating action. The tilting axis (20) is arranged between the rotating axis and operating area.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einer Bedieneinheit mit wenigstens einem um eine erste Drehachse (16) drehbar gelagerten Bedienelement (12), wenigstens einer Flächeneinheit (22), welche einen zu einem Bedienvorgang anfassbaren Bedienbereich (24) des Bedienelementes (12) begrenzt, und wenigstens einer Dreheinheit (18), mittels derer das Bedienelement (12) um wenigstens eine erste Neigungsachse (20) relativ zu der Flächeneinheit (22) neigbar angeordnet ist. Um den Aufbau der Bedieneinheit kompakter zu gestalten, wird vorgeschlagen, dass die erste Neigungsachse (20) zwischen der ersten Drehachse (16) und dem Bedienbereich (24) angeordnet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/04 (2006.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0855668 A2 19980729 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023229 A1 20090211; DE 102007035892 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2018-03-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170830

2017-05-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170419

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS