Global Patent Index - EP 2023299 A1

EP 2023299 A1 2009-02-11 - Method and device for monitoring the transport of multiple objects

Title (en)

Method and device for monitoring the transport of multiple objects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überwachen des Transports mehrerer Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de surveillance du transport de plusieurs objets

Publication

EP 2023299 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08104862 A

Priority

DE 102007034948 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves providing each of set of objects with an identification of destination address. Each object is passed through a sorting system, which produces an image of the object and identifies the address of each object by analysis of the image. Each object is transported to the identified address. The system stores the produced image in a database and analyzes the stored image according to a given analysis-criteria. The system determines whether each object contains or not a given optically detectable feature. The image of the object containing the feature is stored in the database. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a device for monitoring transportation of a set of objects (2) an arrangement with a sorting system and a monitoring device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Überwachen des Transports mehrerer Gegenstände, insbesondere von Postsendungen. Jeder Gegenstand ist mit jeweils einer Kennzeichnung einer Zieladresse versehen. Jeder Gegenstand durchläuft mindestens einmal eine Sortieranlage. Diese Sortieranlage erzeugt jeweils ein Abbild des Gegenstands. Durch Auswertung des Abbilds erkennt die Sortieranlage die Zieladresse des Gegenstands. Jeder Gegenstand wird zur erkannten Zieladresse transportiert. Die Sortieranlage untersucht jeden Gegenstand, der die Sortieranlage innerhalb eines vorgegebenen Zeitraums durchlaufen hat, daraufhin, ob der Gegenstand mindestens eine vorgegebene optisch erfassbare Eigenschaft aufweist oder nicht. Hierfür wertet die Sortieranlage dasjenige Abbild aus, das die Sortieranlage vom Gegenstand erzeugt hat. Die Sortieranlage ist mit einer Datenbank verbunden. Die Sortieranlage speichert ein Abbild eines Gegenstands dann und nur dann in der Datenbank ab, wenn der Gegenstand die Eigenschaft aufweist. Die in der Datenbank abgespeicherten Abbilder werden nach einem vorgegebenen Auswerte-Kriterium ausgewertet.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00435 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00443 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00475 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00709 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023299 A1 20090211; DE 102007034948 A1 20090129; US 2009028383 A1 20090129

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2010-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS