Global Patent Index - EP 2023312 A2

EP 2023312 A2 2009-02-11 - Advertising window

Title (en)

Advertising window

Title (de)

Werbevitrine

Title (fr)

Vitrine publicitaire

Publication

EP 2023312 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08014161 A

Priority

DE 102007037488 A

Abstract (en)

The case (10) has a lower socket (11), and a display cabinet (12) arranged on the socket. The display cabinet exhibits a set of side walls (13-16) and an upper covering (17). An information carrier and an illumination unit (19) are arranged in the upper covering. The side walls and covering of the display cabinet are made of a transparent material such as glass or transparent plastic. The information carrier is arranged on inner or outer surfaces of the side wall.

Abstract (de)

Eine Werbevitrine (10) besitzt einen unteren Sockel (11) und einen auf dem Sockel angeordneten Schaukasten (12), der mehrere Seitenwände (13,14,15,16) und eine obere Abdeckung (17) aufweist und an oder in dem zumindest ein Informationsträger (18) und eine Beleuchtungseinrichtung (19) angeordnet sind. Dabei ist vorgesehen, dass alle Seitenwände des Schaukastens zumindest abschnittsweise und insbesondere vollständig aus einem lichtdurchlässigen Material bestehen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2006.01); G09F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/04 (2013.01); G09F 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023312 A2 20090211; EP 2023312 A3 20100106; EP 2023312 B1 20131016; DE 102007037488 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131016

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502008010800

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 502008010800

2014-10-30 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010800

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140717

2014-07-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008010800

2013-12-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008010800

- Effective date: 20131212

2013-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE TR

2013-06-05 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-05-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 13/04 20060101AFI20130328BHEP

2013-05-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G09F 13/08 20060101ALN20130328BHEP

2010-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE TR

2010-08-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100705

2010-01-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-01-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS