Global Patent Index - EP 2023353 A2

EP 2023353 A2 2009-02-11 - Device for controlling a high electrical field in an insulating synthetic material, in particular for a bushing through a wall

Title (en)

Device for controlling a high electrical field in an insulating synthetic material, in particular for a bushing through a wall

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Kontrollieren eines starken elektrischen Felds in einem synthetischen Isoliermaterial, insbesondere zur Durchführung von Strom durch eine Wand

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler un champ électrique élevé dans un matériau synthétique isolant, notamment pour une traversée de courant à travers une paroi

Publication

EP 2023353 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 08161239 A

Priority

FR 0756986 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a deflector (12), and an annular space (14) provided between the deflector and a central part (31) of a synthetic insulating material (13) surrounding a central conductor (11). A thickness of the annular space is higher than or equal to 10 millimeter, and the space is filled with a dielectric fluid i.e. sulphur hexafluoride. Reinforcement fibers (15) i.e. glass fabric, are placed around the deflector. The synthetic insulating material is thermosetting resin type polymer material, thermoplastic resin type polymer material or elastomer.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif selon l'invention présente une grande fiabilité diélectrique et de l'étanchéité. Le dispositif consiste à ménager un espace annulaire (14) entre la surface interne d'un déflecteur (12) relié à la terre et entourant largement un conducteur central (11) et la partie centrale (31) d'une masse de matériau isolant diélectrique (13) dans laquelle est noyée le conducteur central (11) et le déflecteur (12). Un fluide diélectrique, à savoir de l'hexafluorure de soufre (SF 6 ) ou de l'huile est placé dans cet espace annulaire (14). Application aux traversées étanches de courant électrique haute tension.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/28 (2006.01); H01B 17/00 (2006.01); H01B 17/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/42 (2013.01); H01B 17/005 (2013.01); H01B 17/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2837615 A1 20030926 - ALSTOM [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023353 A2 20090211; EP 2023353 A3 20091209; CN 101436453 A 20090520; CN 101436453 B 20120613; FR 2919955 A1 20090213; FR 2919955 B1 20091030; RU 2008132537 A 20100220; RU 2488183 C2 20130720

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170620

2016-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160719

2011-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC ENERGY FRANCE

2011-10-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC ENERGY FRANCE

2010-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100607

2009-12-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-12-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SAS

2009-11-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SAS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS