Global Patent Index - EP 2023366 A2

EP 2023366 A2 2009-02-11 - Circuit breaker

Title (en)

Circuit breaker

Title (de)

Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur

Publication

EP 2023366 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07024632 A

Priority

JP 2007207998 A

Abstract (en)

A circuit breaker includes inside a crossbar 7, a lower link 6, a lever 4 that rotates during tripping of the circuit breaker, an upper link 12 that configures a toggle link, and main springs 2, with the circuit breaker also including a handle arm 3 that cooperates with these. The handle arm 3 comprises a frame body whose cross section is substantially U-shaped and where one end of two side plates 3b and 3c are joined together by a structural body. At least one of the side plates 3b and 3c is a separate part fixedly attached to the structural body, and the side plates 3b and 3c are fixedly attached to the structural body at positions that do not line up in a straight line on the side plates.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/521 (2013.01); H01H 71/525 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023366 A2 20090211; EP 2023366 A3 20100310; EP 2023366 B1 20110309; CN 101364507 A 20090211; CN 101364507 B 20110504; DE 602007013035 D1 20110421; JP 2009043605 A 20090226; JP 4814848 B2 20111116

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2014-05-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 602007013035

- Effective date: 20140326

2012-04-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007013035

- Effective date: 20111212

2012-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111212

2011-04-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007013035

- Effective date: 20110421

2011-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007013035 P 20110421

2011-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2010-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2010-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION

2010-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WATANABE, KAZUMASA

2010-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FUSHIMI, MASAHIRO

2010-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MURAI, MASATOSHI

2010-07-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01H 71/52 20060101AFI20100615BHEP

2010-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS