Global Patent Index - EP 2023388 A2

EP 2023388 A2 2009-02-11 - Semiconductor package

Title (en)

Semiconductor package

Title (de)

Halbleiterpaket

Title (fr)

Conditionnement de semi-conducteur

Publication

EP 2023388 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08252629 A

Priority

JP 2007205846 A

Abstract (en)

A semiconductor package (10) includes a base plate (12) having first and second surfaces (12a and 12b) both facing in opposite directions, and a plurality of anisotropic heat conducting members (22) disposed in the base plate and spaced away from each other. A semiconductor element (14) having a heat generating unit (14a) is mounted on the first surface, and the second surface is supported on a supporting member having a thermal conductivity. Each anisotropic heat conducting member has a sheet shape intersecting with the first and second surfaces, and orientates a direction of higher thermal conductivity than the thermal conductivity of the base plate in a direction from the first surface toward the second surface.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/367 (2006.01); H01L 23/373 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/3735 (2013.01); H01L 23/3677 (2013.01); H01L 23/3733 (2013.01); H01L 23/373 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (applicant)

JP 2004288949 A 20041014 - KYOCERA CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023388 A2 20090211; EP 2023388 A3 20091111; EP 2023388 B1 20110209; DE 602008004858 D1 20110324; JP 2009043851 A 20090226; JP 4504401 B2 20100714; US 2009039500 A1 20090212; US 7868450 B2 20110111

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170802

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-03-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008004858

- Effective date: 20111110

2012-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111110

2011-03-24 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008004858

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602008004858 P 20110324

2011-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2011-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-07-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-11-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-11-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080811

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS