Global Patent Index - EP 2023436 A1

EP 2023436 A1 2009-02-11 - Mobile terminal with two antennas for reducing the rf radiation exposure of the user

Title (en)

Mobile terminal with two antennas for reducing the rf radiation exposure of the user

Title (de)

Mobiles Endgerät mit zwei Antennen zur Verminderung der Belastung des Benutzers durch elektromagnetische Strahlung im Funkwellenbereich

Title (fr)

Terminal mobile avec deux antennes pour réduire l'exposition aux rayonnements radiofréquence de l'utilisateur.

Publication

EP 2023436 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06116453 A

Priority

EP 06116453 A

Abstract (en)

For a mobile terminal for receiving wireless transmissions from a transmitter and transmitting wireless transmissions to a receiver it proposed to provide an antenna arrangement having a plurality of antenna elements (31, 32) each provided on or within a common body (39) or a respective body of the terminal (30) in a defined spatial relation to a conducting chassis part (33), wherein at least one first antenna element (31) is located on a first side and at least one second antenna element (32) is located on a second side of the same conductive chassis part (33) or of the respective conducting chassis part, wherein high frequency circuitry, for transmitting a respective wireless transmission, is adapted to simultaneously drive said first antenna element and said second antenna element by feeding the same or corresponding high frequency signals to said first antenna element (31) and to said second antenna element (32).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/245 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2008000713 A2 20080103; WO 2008000713 A3 20080228; EP 2023436 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170520

2017-01-25 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JAGIELSKI, OLE

2017-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SVENDSEN, SIMON

2017-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOKSOY, SINAN

2017-01-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FRIEDERICH, ALEXANDER

2014-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS