Global Patent Index - EP 2023463 A2

EP 2023463 A2 2009-02-11 - An emergency luminaire

Title (en)

An emergency luminaire

Title (de)

Notleuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire d'urgence

Publication

EP 2023463 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07118935 A

Priority

CN 200720126689 U

Abstract (en)

An emergency luminairc, including a case made of a front cover, a back cover and an electronic circuit fixed on the back cover, the electronic circuit comprising an AC-DC converter, a charging circuit, a control circuit, a DC-DC converter, a DC-AC converter, an output AC-DC converter and a conversion circuit, wherein: the AC-DC converter converts an input AC into two groups of output DC, the first group being connected with the charging circuit and the second being connected with the control circuit; the charging circuit is adapted to conduct current-limited charge to the battery by the first group of DC; the control circuit is adapted to control conversion between normal lighting and emergency lighting, the voltage test of battery discharge, and conversion status test by the second group of DC; the DC-AC converter includes an oscillating circuit and a boost circuit to produce an output high-frequency and a high-voltage AC with a transformer; the output AC-DC converter further comprises a rectification circuit, a filtering and a current-limited circuit; the DC-DC converter is adapted to convert the battery voltage to high voltage DC suitable for an electronic ballast to work through DC-AC converter and output AC-DC converter, and functions when the AC is turned off, being under-voltage or in test condition; the conversion circuit is adapted to control the conversion between normal lighting and emergency lighting.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02J 9/00 (2006.01); F21S 9/02 (2006.01); H02J 9/02 (2006.01); H02J 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2988 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023463 A2 20090211; EP 2023463 A3 20101117; CN 201069088 Y 20080604

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110518

2011-09-08 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-07-20 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-07-14 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2010-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2010-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02J 9/00 20060101AFI20081111BHEP

2010-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02J 9/02 20060101ALI20101012BHEP

2010-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H02J 9/06 20060101ALI20101012BHEP

2010-11-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 9/02 20060101ALI20101012BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS