Global Patent Index - EP 2023650 A2

EP 2023650 A2 2009-02-11 - Loudspeaker system and fitting device for an electrical and/or electronic device

Title (en)

Loudspeaker system and fitting device for an electrical and/or electronic device

Title (de)

Lautsprechersystem und Montagevorrichtung für eine elektrische und/oder elektronische Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Système de haut-parleur et dispositif de montage pour un dispositif électrique et/ou électronique

Publication

EP 2023650 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013930 A

Priority

DE 102007036761 A

Abstract (en)

The loudspeaker system has an electroacoustic transducer and an assembly holder (200). The assembly holder comprises two ends (210,220), where the former end of the assembly holder is fastened at a firm assembly location and the later end of the assembly holder is formed as an assembly plate. A loudspeaker unit (300) is provided, which comprises a fastening unit (310). Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) an assembly device for an electrical and electronic device (2) a loudspeaker unit has a fastening unit for fastening an assembly device (3) a covering unit for covering the assembly plate of an assembly device.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Lautsprechersystem mit einer Lautsprechereinheit (300) mit mindestens einem elektroakustischen Wandler und einem Montagehalter (200) vorgesehen. Der Montagehalter (200) weist ein erstes und ein zweites Ende (210, 220) auf, wobei das erste Ende (210) an einem festen Montageort befestigbar ist. Das zweite Ende (220) des Montagehalters (200) ist als eine Montageplatte im Wesentlichen senkrecht zu dem Montagehalter (200) ausgebildet. Die Lautsprechereinheit (300) weist eine Befestigungseinheit (310) auf. Die Montageplatte (220) und die Befestigungseinheit (310) sind jeweils derart ausgestaltet, dass die Befestigungseinheit (310) auf der Montageplatte (220) zur mechanischen Montage der Lautsprechereinheit (300) aufgeschoben werden kann. Die erste elektrische Kontaktierung an der Montageplatte (220) und die zweite elektrische Kontaktierung (320) an der Befestigungseinheit (310) sind derart angeordnet, dass die erste und zweite elektrische Kontaktierung (230, 320) einen elektrischen Kontakt sicherstellen, wenn die Befestigungseinheit (310) der Lautsprechereinheit (300) auf die Montageplatte (220) des Montagehalters (200) aufgeschoben wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/026 (2013.01); H04R 2201/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023650 A2 20090211; EP 2023650 A3 20120905; DE 102007036761 A1 20090205; US 2009034771 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-07-04 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130508

2013-05-08 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-05-08 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-09-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 1/02 20060101AFI20120801BHEP

2010-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SENNHEISER ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO. KG

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GLEISSNER, ACHIM

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THEIS, DAVID P.

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WATERS, SUZANNE FIONA SIELSKI

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS