Global Patent Index - EP 2023652 A1

EP 2023652 A1 2009-02-11 - Audio device and method of operating an audio device

Title (en)

Audio device and method of operating an audio device

Title (de)

Akustisches Gerät und Verfahren zum Betrieb eines akustischen Geräts

Title (fr)

Dispositif audio et procédé pour l'opération d'un dispositif audio

Publication

EP 2023652 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07290953 A

Priority

EP 07290953 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to an audio driver device (100) for converting an input signal (s1), preferably an electric input signal, to an output signal (s2) for driving an electromagnetic transducer (200). According to the present invention, said audio driver device (100) comprises filter means (110) for influencing a frequency characteristic of the input signal (s1) and/or the output signal (s2) in order to attain a predetermined frequency characteristic of a magnetic field emitted by an electromagnetic transducer (200) that is supplied with said output signal (s2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/08 (2006.01); H03G 5/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/08 (2013.01); H04R 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023652 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101117

2010-05-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AUDIO DEVICE AND METHOD OF OPERATING AN AUDIO DEVICE

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090824

2009-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090626

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS