Global Patent Index - EP 2023666 A2

EP 2023666 A2 2009-02-11 - Switching device and method for switching a hearing aid

Title (en)

Switching device and method for switching a hearing aid

Title (de)

Schalteranordnung und Verfahren zum Umschalten eines Hörgeräts

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de commutation pour commuter un appareil auditif

Publication

EP 2023666 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104714 A

Priority

DE 102007037025 A

Abstract (en)

The switching arrangement comprises a socket cover (2) which covers a socket connector (4). The socket connector and the socket cover are arranged in such a manner that an electrical switching contact is produced by pressure on the socket connector. A contact element is also produced with a rear ear part. An independent claim is included for switching a hearing aid.

Abstract (de)

Schalteranordnung für Hörgeräte, die eine durch eine Buchsenabdeckung (2) abdeckbare Steckerbuchse (4) umfasst. Die Steckerbuchse (4) und die Buchsenabdeckung (2) sind derart angeordnet und ausgestaltet, dass durch Druck auf die die Steckerbuchse (4) abdeckende Buchsenabdeckung (2) ein elektrischer Schaltkontakt herstellbar ist. Außerdem wird ein Verfahren zur Programmumschaltung von Hörgeräten mit einem Hinter-dem-Ohr-Teil angegeben, bei dem mittels Steckerbuchse (4) des Hinter-dem-Ohr-Teils und ihrer Buchsenabdeckung (2) durch Druckeinwirkung ein elektrischer Schaltkontakt hergestellt wird. Dadurch kann Platz gespart werden.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/65 (2013.01); H04R 25/556 (2013.01); H04R 25/60 (2013.01); H04R 2225/61 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 102005037897 B3 20070412 - SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023666 A2 20090211; EP 2023666 A3 20140716; DE 102007037025 A1 20090226; DE 102007037025 B4 20110922; US 2009042426 A1 20090212; US 8135154 B2 20120313

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20180316

2015-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIVANTOS GMBH

2015-03-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-03-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2015-03-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2015-03-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2015-03-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2014-08-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20140718

2014-08-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2014-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2014-07-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 25/00 20060101AFI20140611BHEP

2010-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SWITCHING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SWITCHING A HEARING AID

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS