Global Patent Index - EP 2023668 A2

EP 2023668 A2 2009-02-11 - Hearing aid with visualised psycho-acoustic magnitudes and corresponding method

Title (en)

Hearing aid with visualised psycho-acoustic magnitudes and corresponding method

Title (de)

Hörgerät mit visualisierter psychoakustischer Größe und entsprechendes Verfahren

Title (fr)

Appareil auditif avec visualisation des grandeurs psycho-acoustiques et procédé correspondant

Publication

EP 2023668 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104718 A

Priority

DE 102007035172 A

Abstract (en)

A hearing device (10) has a signal processing unit having microphone (11), an amplifier module (12) and a receiver (13).The signal processing unit process an input sound (E1) into an output sound (A1).A perceptive model (14) has a digital processor, which is implemented in the amplifier module of the signal processing unit. The psychoacoustic variable such as loudness etc. is transmitted by the perceptive model to a remote control (15) for visualization process based on the output sound. An independent claim is included for method for operating hearing device.

Abstract (de)

Die Einstellung bzw. Anpassung eines Hörgeräts für einen Nutzer insbesondere für Kinder und Menschen mit Mehrfachbehinderungen soll vereinfacht werden. Dazu wird ein Hörgerät mit einer Signalverarbeitungseinrichtung zur Verarbeitung eines Eingangsschalls (E1) zu einem Ausgangsschall (A1) bereitgestellt, wobei in der Signalverarbeitungseinrichtung oder in einer mit ihr in Datenverbindung stehenden Verarbeitungseinrichtung ein perzeptives Modell (14) implementiert ist, mit dem bezogen auf den Ausgangsschall (A1) eine psychoakustische Größe (P) bereitstellbar ist. Eine Visualisierungseinrichtung (17), beispielsweise in eine die Verarbeitungseinrichtung aufweisende Fernbedienung (15) integriert, ist mit der Signalverarbeitungseinrichtung vorzugsweise drahtlos verbunden. Somit lässt sich ein Wert der psychoakustischen Größe (P) entsprechend visualisieren. Auf diese Weise erhält eine betreuende Person eine Information über die Wahrnehmung des von dem Hörgerät gelieferten Schalls durch den Nutzer, wodurch dem Betreuenden die Einstellung erleichtert wird.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/70 (2013.01); H04R 25/552 (2013.01); H04R 25/558 (2013.01); H04R 2225/41 (2013.01); H04R 2225/61 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023668 A2 20090211; EP 2023668 A3 20150325; DE 102007035172 A1 20090205; US 2009028362 A1 20090129; US 8213650 B2 20120703

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIVANTOS PTE. LTD.

2016-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160712

2015-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-12-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2015-12-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2015-12-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2015-12-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2015-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-11-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-11-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIVANTOS PTE. LTD.

2015-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2015-03-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 25/00 20060101AFI20150216BHEP

2010-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HEARING AID WITH VISUALISED PSYCHO-ACOUSTIC MAGNITUDES AND CORRESPONDING METHOD

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS